Accounts and annual returns THE ALAN MATTEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118132
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 April 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 07 April 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 23 March 2021 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 19 April 2021 384 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required