Financial history THE ALAN MATTEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118132
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £2.50k £0 £151.29k £0 £125.00k
Total expenditure £1.50k £0 £104.59k £32.30k £121.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A