FRIENDS OF ROCK SCHOOL

Charity number: 1117575
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.53k £3.52k £3.67k £4.09k £5.53k
Total expenditure £6.54k £6.02k £5.54k £10.08k £27.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A