FRIENDS OF ROCK SCHOOL

Charity number: 1117575
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LOUISE PHILLIPS Trustee 22 March 2011 None on record
Martin Elven Trustee 02 November 2013 None on record
Mark Perry Trustee 06 June 2016 None on record
Lee Harry Peter Dorman Chair 24 September 2020 None on record
Domenico Bergonzi Trustee 30 October 2013 None on record
SUE JANE WOOD Trustee None on record