THE BEN WILLIAMS TRUST

Charity number: 1116627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required