Financial history THE GALVANI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1116060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £5.38k £7.47k £3.21k £7.88k £2.57k
Total expenditure £10.27k £9.85k £6.65k £11.87k £10.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A