Financial history THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF MANAGEMENT

Charity number: 1117999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £805.09k £712.92k £799.27k £479.74k £594.81k
Total expenditure £569.54k £658.66k £924.38k £759.72k £589.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £804.94k £712.92k £798.39k N/A £589.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £157 £0 £885 N/A £4.99k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £569.54k £658.66k £924.38k N/A £587.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £2.11k
Expenditure - Governance £26.80k £21.00k £24.83k N/A £8.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £32.01k £0 N/A £99.18k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £2.11k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0