Trustees THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF MANAGEMENT

Charity number: 1117999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Emma Louise Parry Chair 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Sarah Katrina Robinson Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Charles Duncan Thornton Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Professor Kathryn Jan Bebbington Trustee 03 August 2022
None on record
Professor David Boateng Sarpong Trustee 01 January 2022
MILESTONES TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Russell James Glennon Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr Ashley James Byron Roberts Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Pawan Budhwar Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Stephanie Decker Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr Katherine Emma Black Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Martyna Anna Sliwa Trustee 15 June 2020
None on record
Professor Savvas Papagiannidis Trustee 31 December 2019
None on record
Professor Katherine Jane Mason Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Dr Neil Pyper Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record