MAGDALENE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 19/07/2016 19/07/2017 19/07/2018 19/07/2019 19/07/2020
Total gross income £771 £318 £332 £323 £312
Total expenditure £15 £15 £0 £0 £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A