FRIENDS OF SEVAI SOCIETY UK

Charity number: 1116964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2019 23 March 2021 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 17 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required