FRIENDS OF SEVAI SOCIETY UK

Charity number: 1116964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/07/2018 30/07/2019 30/07/2020
Total gross income £2.08k £2.15k £2.13k £885 £660
Total expenditure £2.50k £3.00k £3.04k £2.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A