ALLIANCE PUBLISHING TRUST

Charity number: 1116744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £296.24k £250.12k £230.33k £309.65k £422.51k
Total expenditure £273.06k £235.60k £269.45k £263.23k £311.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A