Accounts and annual returns WOODSLEY ROAD MULTICULTURAL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1118135
Charity reporting is overdue by 488 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 June 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 June 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 September 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 22 September 2020 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 September 2020 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 22 September 2020 480 days late Download Open in new window