Financial history WOODSLEY ROAD MULTICULTURAL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1118135
Charity reporting is overdue by 547 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £33.65k £33.57k £41.44k £43.72k £65.72k
Total expenditure £25.28k £44.55k £45.15k £43.62k £40.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k