SCHOOL CONNECT

Charity number: 1119269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 January 2021 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 April 2019 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 March 2018 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required