HIGH VIEW PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1117453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.47k £13.69k £20.55k £15.75k £5.75k
Total expenditure £16.70k £22.29k £11.08k £13.18k £15.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A