LITTLE ANGELS TRUST

Charity number: 1126333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £7.03k £7.74k £7.43k £16.66k £4.04k
Total expenditure £6.90k £7.96k £9.02k £7.07k £8.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A