BRENT REFUGEES AND MIGRANTS FORUM

Charity number: 1117090
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 15/04/2011 14/04/2012
Total gross income £52.26k £75.56k £65.04k £39.45k £0
Total expenditure £77.67k £93.65k £70.70k £67.03k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A