DILHAM VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1118467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required