DILHAM VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1118467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.33k £11.79k £7.52k £26.86k £15.24k
Total expenditure £9.80k £9.28k £10.92k £30.94k £8.01k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £6.00k