Financial history ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT PREPARATORY SCHOOL GRAVESEND

Charity number: 1119139
Charity reporting is overdue by 217 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.31m £925.66k £924.53k £835.19k £833.91k
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.17m £1.04m £1.02m £1.02m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £61.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £15.69k £20 £0 £300 £0
Income - Other trading activities £13.85k £6.12k £13.84k £11.19k £12.42k
Income - Charitable activities £1.26m £907.66k £894.19k £810.60k £755.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.52k £2.29k £1.99k £2.05k £953
Income - Other £16.56k £9.58k £14.50k £11.05k £65.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.16m £1.04m £1.02m £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.88k £4.27k £6.74k £4.56k £4.53k
Expenditure - Governance £4.03k £4.17k £4.08k £4.20k £4.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0