SOHAM ACTION 4 YOUTH

Charity number: 1119761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £5.64k £4.83k £2.43k £400 £0
Total expenditure £5.82k £3.79k £6.43k £2.02k £2.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A