Trustees NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE REFUGEE FORUM

Charity number: 1121560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Ann Fleming Chair 29 November 2018
THE A AND E EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 75 days
Paddy Tipping Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Fiona Becker Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Jenny Rose-Myers Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Bilal Hazzouri Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Graham Ferris Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Heidi Richardson Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Darren York Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
Caroline Mombeyarara Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
Dr Helen O'Nions Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
Allan Njanji Trustee 27 November 2019
THE NOTTINGHAM ARIMATHEA TRUST
Received: 86 days late
Roger Tanner Trustee 29 November 2018
None on record