THE CIARAN BUCKLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1117246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 October 2020 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 October 2019 16 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 18 October 2018 12 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 18 October 2017 22 October 2018 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 18 October 2016 17 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2016 Not Required