THE CIARAN BUCKLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1117246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 18/10/2016 18/10/2017 18/10/2018 18/10/2019 18/10/2020
Total gross income £345 £578 £57 £49 £24
Total expenditure £216 £216 £216 £216 £216
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A