Governing document SOUTH HERTS AND EDGWARE MASORTI
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 OCT 2021 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 MAR 2022 as amended on 04 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE PRACTICE AND TEACHING OF TRADITIONAL JUDAISM IN THE TRADITION OF THE JEWISH RELIGIOUS CONSERVATIVE MOVEMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND ISRAEL 3.2 THE ORIGINAL UNINCORPORATED LEGAL ORGANISATION TO WHICH THE SYNAGOGUE IS THE SUCCESSOR WAS ESTABLISHED IN 1984 TO CREATE AN INDEPENDENT CONGREGATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.