Accounts and annual returns WORCESTERSHIRE PARENT AND CARERS COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1122583
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 February 2022 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 February 2022 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window