Accounts and annual returns SOMEBODY'S DAUGHTER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1117870
Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 474 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 474 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 840 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 840 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1205 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1205 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required