COMMAND PRAYER CENTRE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1118094
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 01 April 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 01 April 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 15 June 2018 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 15 June 2018 76 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 10 April 2017 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 10 April 2017 10 days late Download