COMMAND PRAYER CENTRE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1118094
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £103.75k £92.30k £85.08k £78.20k £94.41k
Total expenditure £100.94k £94.70k £99.74k £74.83k £82.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £200 £3.19k N/A N/A £14.80k