Hear Me Out Music

Charity number: 1119049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £202.03k £201.65k £239.95k £209.26k £246.03k
Total expenditure £213.91k £192.98k £227.81k £223.80k £227.75k
Income from government contracts £16.64k £2.40k £2.48k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £14.98k N/A