MALVERN CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1117906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Edward Vaughan Davies Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
JENNIFER PATRICIA COWPE Trustee 05 February 2020
ST RICHARDS HOSPICE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Stephen Goodenough Trustee 09 November 2018
THE MALVERN SINGERS Received: On time
ENGAGEMALVERN Received: On time
Dr JOHN HARCUP OBE Trustee 01 October 2000 None on record
ROGER WILLIAM BRIAN SUTTON Trustee None on record
JOHN ALBERT DIXON Trustee None on record
KATHARINE ANN BARBER Trustee None on record
Jennifer Chuck Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Adlam Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
Mr Andrew Huntley Trustee 01 October 2014
THE FRIENDS OF MALVERN PRIORY Received: On time
HEREFORDSHIRE GROWING POINT Received: On time
Dr Michael Hugo Pritchard Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
Brian Philip Iles Trustee
MALVERN COMMUNITY FOREST Received: On time