Accounts and annual returns MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL AND FINANCIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1118756
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 171 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 171 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 20 March 2021 409 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required