ST AUSTIN'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118091
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 April 2021 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 April 2021 654 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 July 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required