SEAPOINT CANOE CENTRE

Charity number: 1122984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/03/2016 04/03/2017 04/03/2018 04/03/2019 04/03/2020
Total gross income £50.18k £33.68k £87.03k £14.99k £33.84k
Total expenditure £47.44k £35.89k £48.69k £20.98k £33.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.46k N/A N/A N/A