MUROLE HIGH SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1118190
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £27.04k £20.28k £18.62k £14.55k £12.42k
Total expenditure £24.95k £21.20k £23.88k £22.12k £12.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A