LONDON TAGALOG CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1118219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rustan Boisa Estrada Trustee 27 November 2016 None on record
MICHAEL VOLKMER Trustee 25 June 1996 None on record
Jonah Magsino Trustee 10 June 2017 None on record
Michael Vince Villegas Mora Trustee 02 February 2019 None on record
Lino Jr Cabugason Cabauatan Trustee 10 June 2017 None on record
SAMSON MAGNASE Chair 20 July 2010 None on record