Financial history REDS IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1118735
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £893.34k £1.01m £1.02m £1.34m £974.24k
Total expenditure £807.88k £979.75k £1.01m £1.24m £941.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £709.22k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £739.56k £66.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £724.85k £859.68k £924.81k £115.84k £55.74k
Income - Other trading activities £168.43k £151.84k £94.22k £63.77k £108.74k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £1.05m £731.84k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £67 £83 £302 £202 £24
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £100.79k £77.90k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £807.88k £979.75k £1.01m £1.24m £941.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.24k £24.48k £0 £0 £24.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0