KENT WIDE DOWN SYNDROME GROUP

Charity number: 1119018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 March 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 February 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 February 2019 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required