KENT WIDE DOWN SYNDROME GROUP

Charity number: 1119018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.68k £10.16k £10.34k £5.97k £6.51k
Total expenditure £6.59k £5.70k £10.66k £12.95k £8.18k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A