Financial history BEACON (BRADFORD ECUMENICAL ASYLUM CONCERN)

Charity number: 1119463
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £49.60k £64.86k £59.51k £78.40k £50.29k
Total expenditure £37.96k £46.18k £50.34k £52.19k £53.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £6.00k