Trustees BEACON (BRADFORD ECUMENICAL ASYLUM CONCERN)

Charity number: 1119463
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev SARAH ANN JEMISON Chair 11 November 2014
None on record
Edward Sterling Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Mary Margaret Brooks Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Barbara Clarke Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
ROLAND CLARK Trustee 01 April 2016
L'ARCHE
Received: On time
CITY OF BRADFORD YMCA
Received: On time
HEATHER GRINTER Trustee 04 April 2012
None on record
WILL SUTCLIFFE Trustee 01 September 2011
BRADFORD CITY OF SANCTUARY
Received: On time