THE LONDON CHURCHES FUND FOR DESTITUTE ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1121108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £35.59k £32.10k £28.78k £34.39k £42.44k
Total expenditure £28.56k £34.08k £31.53k £34.34k £37.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A