Trustees SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1118646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN DAVID MILES Chair 20 February 2007
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
Bernard Gregory Birdseye Trustee 24 February 2020
None on record
Graham James Varney Trustee 28 October 2019
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
ST HUGH'S SCHOOL (CARSWELL) TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr Rachel Starer Trustee 02 October 2017
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
JULIE FINDLEY Trustee 02 October 2017
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
Gillian Nineham Trustee 21 September 2009
OXFORD CENTRE FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN PALLIATIVE CARE: SOBELL HOUSE
Received: On time
MR JOHN HOLLORAN Trustee 24 September 2007
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr WILLIAM COULDRICK Trustee 20 February 2007
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
HUGH EVERARD DUNCAN FRASER Trustee 20 February 2007
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
SANDRA NASH Trustee 20 February 2007
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
VIVIENNE SPURGE Trustee 20 February 2007
SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY
Received: On time
MARYROSE DANVERS HODGSON Trustee 20 February 2007
None on record