Financial history BURY ST EDMUNDS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1119059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.10m £501.24k £93.12k £47.78k £106.80k
Total expenditure £160.89k £587.91k £791.91k £206.74k £92.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £37.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.25k £501.24k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £16.47k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.07m £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £250 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £132.51k £551.21k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £28.38k £34.20k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £800 £2.50k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £2.50k N/A N/A N/A