WETMORE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1118632
Charity reporting is overdue by 1798 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2008 28/02/2009 28/02/2010 28/02/2011 29/02/2012
Total gross income £2.93k £1.59k £900 £549 £1.47k
Total expenditure £10.83k £1.25k £1.50k £3.13k £1.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A