Trustees Hornsey Girls Home School Association
Charity number: 1120407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antonia Pelari | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Broomhall | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Herted | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Murdock | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Cervi | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Syz | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Virve Enne | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Ruth Cormacain | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Marsden | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.