BARWAQA RELIEF ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1121274
Charity reporting is up to date (118 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 27 July 2021 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 27 July 2021 118 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 04 September 2019 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 September 2019 157 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 27 June 2018 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 27 June 2018 88 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 02 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 02 August 2016 On time Download