VITTORIA PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.86k £3.50k £2.12k £1.41k £310
Total expenditure £1.00k £2.33k £488 £225 £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A