WHITEHAVEN HARBOUR YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1120763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £218.59k £194.84k £229.82k £230.50k £263.96k
Total expenditure £217.34k £214.73k £228.24k £248.72k £227.67k
Income from government contracts £13.13k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.06k £135.71k £9.83k £9.83k